This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/08/2021 at 04:30:36 (UTC).

Blancher VS KRG JCS, LLC, a limited liability compang

Case Summary

On 08/10/2018 Blancher filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against KRG JCS, LLC, a limited liability compang. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PAUL D. HERBERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6321

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

PAUL D. HERBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

BLANCHER, JAMES

Defendants and Debtor / Appellees

KECK, LARRY

KELLY COMPANIES OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, LLC

FUN EATS AND DRINKS, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

KRG JCS, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BRISCOE, JOHN P.

MASCHLER, BRIAN P.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/12/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/1/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/1/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/30/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/30/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/11/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/14/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

1/28/2020: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/14/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

Initial Case Management Conference 01/09/2019 03:00 PM D- 20

8/16/2018: Initial Case Management Conference 01/09/2019 03:00 PM D- 20

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

3/12/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

Notice to Court Re Status of Class Settlement Filed

2/22/2021: Notice to Court Re Status of Class Settlement Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: Modifying Payment Schedule Under Class Action Settl

3/8/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: Modifying Payment Schedule Under Class Action Settl

Declaration regarding Notice and Settlement Administration Filed

1/21/2021: Declaration regarding Notice and Settlement Administration Filed

Declaration in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Filed

1/21/2021: Declaration in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlem

1/21/2021: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlem

Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Filed

1/21/2021: Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Filed

Proposed Order Filed

1/21/2021: Proposed Order Filed

Proof of Service on Motion

1/21/2021: Proof of Service on Motion

Declaration (Supplemental) of John P Briscoe in support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action

2/4/2021: Declaration (Supplemental) of John P Briscoe in support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 20; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/18/2022 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: Modifying Payment Schedule Under Class Action Settl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Court Re Status of Class Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration (Supplemental) of John P Briscoe in support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Paul D. Herbert; Department: Dept 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement; Judge: Paul D. Herbert; Department: Dept 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for KRG JCS, LLC, a limited liability compang, Larry Keck

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Larry Keck Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to KRG JCS, LLC, a limited liability compang Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Fun Eats and Drinks, LLC, a limited liability company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Kelly Companies of Southern California, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 01/09/2019 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for James Blancher

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FUN EATS AND DRINKS, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASCHLER, BRIAN P.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Briscoe, John P