This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/21/2023 at 19:59:51 (UTC).

BLACKBURN vs DAP, INC. K/N/A LA MIRADA PRODUCTS CO., INC., et al.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 BLACKBURN filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against DAP, INC K/N/A LA MIRADA PRODUCTS CO , INC ,. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Patrick McKinney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3144

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Patrick McKinney

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Benno Ashrafi

DAP, INC. k/n/a LA MIRADA PRODUCTS CO., INC.

Dino Blackburn

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., f/k/a and individually and as successor in interest to ALLIED SIGNAL, INC., individually and as successor in interest to BENDIX CORPORATION

INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY, individually and as successor in interest to CHAMPION INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION as successor in interest to U.S. PLYWOOD CORPORATION

SOCO WEST, INC. f/k/a BRENNTAG WEST, INC. f/k/a SOCO-LYNCH CORPORATION successor in interest to WESTERN CHEMICAL & MANUFACTURING, CO.

T.M. COBB COMPANY

VOLVO GROUP NORTH AMERICA, INC., individually and as successor in interest to WHITE MOTOR COMPANY, MACK TRUCKS, INC., EUCLID, INC., and THE AUTOCAR COMPANY

WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY

ALGOMA HARDWOODS, INC., individually and successor in interest to ALGOMA DOOR, INC.

Andrew Ira Port

Designated Defense Counsel

ELEMENTIS CHEMICALS, INC., f/k/a HARCROS CHEMICAL, INC., individually and as successor in interest to HARRISONS & CROSFIELD (PACIFIC) INC.

Emily Diane Bergstrom

GINA A. HARAN

Hillary Huth

James Ostertag

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC.

Kevin Sutherland

8 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

08/16/2023: Request for Dismissal

Answer

08/16/2023: Answer

Tentative Ruling (Initial Case Management Conference)

08/14/2023: Tentative Ruling (Initial Case Management Conference)

Case Management Statement

08/11/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer

08/08/2023: Answer

Case Management Statement

08/10/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service - Non Service

08/10/2023: Proof of Service - Non Service

Proof of Personal Service

08/10/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

08/04/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

08/04/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

08/04/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

08/04/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

08/01/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

07/28/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

07/28/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

08/01/2023: Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Does Substitution)

07/26/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Does Substitution)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Does Substitution)

07/25/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Does Substitution)

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • DocketMessage: Tentative Ruling Published for 08/25/2023 9:00 AM Initial Case Management Conference}; Category: Tentative Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Dino Blackburn (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Designated Defense Counsel (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service - Non Service Filed by: Dino Blackburn (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Dino Blackburn (Plaintiff) As to: ALGOMA HARDWOODS, INC., individually and successor in interest to ALGOMA DOOR, INC. (Defendant) Service Cost: 322.20 Service Date: 08/09/2023 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketMessage: Order to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees by:; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Dino Blackburn (Plaintiff) As to: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (Defendant) Service Cost: 322.20 Service Date: 07/27/2023 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Dino Blackburn (Plaintiff) As to: PFIZER INC. (Defendant) Service Cost: 322.20 Service Date: 07/27/2023 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Dino Blackburn (Plaintiff) As to: INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY, individually and as successor in interest to CHAMPION INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION as successor in interest to U.S. PLYWOOD CORPORATION (Defendant); VOLVO GROUP NORTH AMERICA, INC., individually and as successor in interest to WHITE MOTOR COMPANY, MACK TRUCKS, INC., EUCLID, INC., and THE AUTOCAR COMPANY (Defendant) Service Date: 12/09/2022 Service Cost: 96.20 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Dino Blackburn (Plaintiff) As to: VOLVO GROUP NORTH AMERICA, INC., individually and as successor in interest to WHITE MOTOR COMPANY, MACK TRUCKS, INC., EUCLID, INC., and THE AUTOCAR COMPANY (Defendant) Service Date: 12/09/2022 Service Cost: 206.20 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case assigned to Hon. Richard Seabolt in Department 20 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse; Category: Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by: Dino Blackburn (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/19/2023 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 20; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: The case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type; Category: Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: Dino Blackburn (Plaintiff) As to: DAP, INC. k/n/a LA MIRADA PRODUCTS CO., INC. (Defendant); HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., f/k/a and individually and as successor in interest to ALLIED SIGNAL, INC., individually and as successor in interest to BENDIX CORPORATION (Defendant); INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY, individually and as successor in interest to CHAMPION INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION as successor in interest to U.S. PLYWOOD CORPORATION (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: Dino Blackburn (Plaintiff) As to: DAP, INC. k/n/a LA MIRADA PRODUCTS CO., INC. (Defendant); HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., f/k/a and individually and as successor in interest to ALLIED SIGNAL, INC., individually and as successor in interest to BENDIX CORPORATION (Defendant); INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY, individually and as successor in interest to CHAMPION INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION as successor in interest to U.S. PLYWOOD CORPORATION (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Filed by: Dino Blackburn (Plaintiff) As to: DAP, INC. k/n/a LA MIRADA PRODUCTS CO., INC. (Defendant); HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., f/k/a and individually and as successor in interest to ALLIED SIGNAL, INC., individually and as successor in interest to BENDIX CORPORATION (Defendant); INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY, individually and as successor in interest to CHAMPION INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION as successor in interest to U.S. PLYWOOD CORPORATION (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less