This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/10/2020 at 07:21:41 (UTC).

BIT Macarthur Commons Investors Holdings LLC VS Noblet

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 BIT Macarthur Commons Investors Holdings LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Noblet. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4695

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIT MACARTHUR COMMONS INVESTORS HOLDINGS LLC

Defendants

NOBLET, ANDREW

NOBLET, KATHLEEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HARRIS, KEVIN A

 

Court Documents

Complaint Forcible Detainer Filed

9/23/2020: Complaint Forcible Detainer Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for BIT Macarthur Commons Investors Holdings LLC

9/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for BIT Macarthur Commons Investors Holdings LLC

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: Issuing Summons

9/24/2020: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: Issuing Summons

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

9/24/2020: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

Summons Issued and Filed

9/24/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: Issuing Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for BIT Macarthur Commons Investors Holdings LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Forcible Detainer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less