This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/06/2020 at 00:14:37 (UTC).

Bishop VS Richfield Metal & Recycling Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 Bishop filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Richfield Metal Recycling Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3484

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BISHOP, ALMA

Defendants

RODRIGUEZ, DANIEL

RICHFIELD METAL & RECYCLING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CLOYD, JEREMY

NAKAGAWA, EDWIN S.

HOME III, W. STUART

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

11/15/2019: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alma Bishop

11/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alma Bishop

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

11/15/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

11/18/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 04/07/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

11/18/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 04/07/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Richfield Metal & Recycling Inc. Filed

12/6/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Richfield Metal & Recycling Inc. Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Richfield Metal & Recycling Inc.

12/27/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Richfield Metal & Recycling Inc.

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Richfield Metal & Recycling Inc. Filed

1/16/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Richfield Metal & Recycling Inc. Filed

Association of Attorneys Filed

3/12/2020: Association of Attorneys Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Daniel Rodriguez

2/26/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Daniel Rodriguez

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/17/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

5/30/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Statement of Alma Bishop Filed

5/26/2020: Case Management Statement of Alma Bishop Filed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

5/21/2020: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Daniel Rodriguez

4/27/2020: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Daniel Rodriguez

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Alma Bishop Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Daniel Rodriguez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/04/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssociation of Attorneys Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Daniel Rodriguez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Richfield Metal & Recycling Inc. Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Richfield Metal & Recycling Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Richfield Metal & Recycling Inc. Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/07/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alma Bishop

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less