This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 08:11:33 (UTC).

Bernstein VS Leotek Electronics USA LLC

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 Bernstein filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Leotek Electronics USA LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES REILLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5416

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

APPEL, JUDITH KAY

BERNSTEIN , ALISON

TANKO STREET LIGHTING, INC.

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

NEWBY, JOHN ROBERT

CITY OF BERKELEY

LEOTEK ELECTRONICS USA LLC

NEWBY, JOHN

TANKO STREETLIGHTING, INC.

ASSOCIATES LIGHTING REPRESENTATIVES INC

GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY INC

TANKO STREET LIGHTING, INC.

JOHN ROBERT NEWBY

TANKO STREETLIGHTING, INC

ROES 1 THROUGH 25

GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CLOYD, JEREMY

SMITH, MICHAEL J.

CARUANA, MARIA A.

YEN, THOMAS

MATEI, LORENA

FEENEY, THOMAS J.

PHILLIPS, ROBERT K.

NAVARATNASINGHAM, PRIYA

FAIZ, FARIMAH

SIMONSON, JOHN S

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/12/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/12/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/6/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/6/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/2/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for Associates Lighting Representatives Inc

9/20/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Associates Lighting Representatives Inc

Cross-Complaint Filed for Associates Lighting Representatives Inc

9/20/2021: Cross-Complaint Filed for Associates Lighting Representatives Inc

Summons Issued and Filed

9/20/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

9/20/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed

9/22/2020: Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Graybar Electric Company Inc

9/13/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Graybar Electric Company Inc

Cross-Complaint Filed for Graybar Electric Company Inc

9/14/2021: Cross-Complaint Filed for Graybar Electric Company Inc

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Associates Lighting Representatives Inc Filed

8/23/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Associates Lighting Representatives Inc Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Graybar Electric Company Inc Filed

8/23/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Graybar Electric Company Inc Filed

Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Graybar Electric Company, Inc.

8/13/2021: Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Graybar Electric Company, Inc.

Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

8/13/2021: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

8/13/2021: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Graybar Electric Company, Inc. Filed

7/6/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Graybar Electric Company, Inc. Filed

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for Associates Lighting Representatives Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Associates Lighting Representatives Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for Graybar Electric Company Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Graybar Electric Company Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Graybar Electric Company Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for City of Berkeley (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for John Newby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to John Robert Newby Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to City of Berkeley Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 07/06/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alison Bernstein

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEOTEK ELECTRONICS USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMONSON, JOHN S.