This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/08/2020 at 03:14:54 (UTC).

Berg VS K Bali Construction, Inc.,

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 Berg filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against K Bali Construction, Inc . This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PULIDO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7103

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN PULIDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOLTANI, SOPHIE

BERG, WILLIAM

Defendant

K BALI CONSTRUCTION, INC.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CARROLL, BRYCE D.

ESTABROOK, GREGORY

 

Court Documents

Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)

10/17/2019: Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)

Compliance Hearing 01/13/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

10/24/2019: Compliance Hearing 01/13/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

11/7/2019: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/10/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/10/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of K Bali Construction, Inc., Filed

8/30/2019: Case Management Statement of K Bali Construction, Inc., Filed

Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for William Berg, Sophie Soltani

8/30/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for William Berg, Sophie Soltani

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

8/20/2019: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 09/10/2019 03:00 PM D- 517

7/22/2019: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 09/10/2019 03:00 PM D- 517

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

7/15/2019: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Order to Relate/Reassign Case(s) Filed

7/15/2019: Order to Relate/Reassign Case(s) Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for K Bali Construction, Inc.,

7/15/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for K Bali Construction, Inc.,

Letter re payment of court fees Received

7/15/2019: Letter re payment of court fees Received

Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

6/24/2019: Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference and Order Filed

5/24/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference and Order Filed

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

4/26/2019: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

4/26/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for William Berg

4/26/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for William Berg

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Civil Jury Trial 08/17/2020 08:30 AM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Pretrial Conference 08/07/2020 01:30 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 07/07/2020 09:00 AM D- 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Case Management Conf Continuance 06/08/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Motion for Summary Judgment 11/19/2019 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 01/13/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketCourt File Transfer to Hayward Hall of Justice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Bryce D. Carroll in Support of Opposition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to K Bali Construction, Inc.'s Motion for Change of Venue Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion for Change of Venue Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Jordan A. Rodman in Support of K Bali Construction Inc.'s Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to K Bali Construction, Inc., Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Change of Venue Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for William Berg

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Estabrook, Gregory

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARROLL, BRYCE D.