Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 04:30:48 (UTC).

BERAN VS BERAN (Non-DCSS)

Case Summary

On 01/09/2003 BERAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BERAN Non-DCSS. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JACOB BLEA III, ALICE VILARDI, STEPHEN F. FOLAND and DENNIS K. ROTHHAAR, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2569

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JACOB BLEA III

ALICE VILARDI

STEPHEN F. FOLAND

DENNIS K. ROTHHAAR, PORE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BERAN, CYNTHIA LYNN

Respondent

BERAN, BRIAN LEE

Other

ALAMEDA COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WHIPPLE, MARY C.

SYMENS-BUCHER, TERRY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2011
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail sent to Cynthia Hughes Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail sent to Brian Beran Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • DocketNotice Regarding Payment of Support Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • DocketOrder/Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • DocketFindings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • DocketProposed Order Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketMinutes: Order to Show Cause re Modification; Judge: Alice Vilardi; Department: Dept 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketConfidential Mediation Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • DocketOSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2011
  • DocketMediation Report Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2003
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re Modification Child Custody,.. Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2003
  • DocketStipulation and Order FOR CC,CV & OTHER ORDERS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2003
  • DocketDeclaration UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2003
  • DocketResponse FILED - FEE PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2003
  • DocketProof of Service OF PTN,SUMMONS FILED;SERVICE DATE 1/10/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2003
  • DocketNotice of Acknowledgment of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2003
  • DocketSummons Filed, Date of Service: (BLANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2003
  • DocketDeclaration UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2003
  • DocketSummons on Petition Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2003
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALAMEDA COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Whipple, Mary C.