This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 19:14:25 (UTC).

Bell VS City of Oakland

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 Bell filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Oakland. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Julia Spain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5644

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Julia Spain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Celeste Bell

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PARKS AND RECREATION

CITY OF OAKLAND

COUNTY OF ALAMEDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Anthony Werbin

Courtney Herrity O'Brien

Jeffrey R Vincent

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/13/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 12/01/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

7/20/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 12/01/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

Answer

10/22/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

10/12/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

09/13/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party California Department of Parks and Recrea Request for Dismissal w/o Prejudice as to party

10/01/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party California Department of Parks and Recrea Request for Dismissal w/o Prejudice as to party

Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

09/14/2021: Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

09/13/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to California Department of Parks and Recreation Filed

09/07/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to California Department of Parks and Recreation Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party County of Alameda Filed Request for Dismissal w/o Prejudice as to party

08/31/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party County of Alameda Filed Request for Dismissal w/o Prejudice as to party

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

08/25/2021: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for California Department of Parks and Recreation

08/25/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for California Department of Parks and Recreation

Proof of Service on Complaint As to County of Alameda Filed

08/23/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to County of Alameda Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

07/20/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 12/01/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

07/20/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 12/01/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

07/19/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Celeste Bell

07/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Celeste Bell

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

07/19/2021: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: City of Oakland (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketMessage: ERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 32, col 39] with Document:34606245; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service by Mail Filed by: Celeste Bell (Plaintiff) As to: City of Oakland (Defendant) After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint?: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Dismissal As to Defendant: California Department of Parks and Recreation Entered; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party California Department of Parks and Recrea; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketMessage: Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMessage: Declaration of Service by Mail; Category: DSM002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMessage: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 03/16/2023 10:00 AM D- 520; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 05/03/2023 09:00 AM D- 302; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Jury Trial 05/26/2023 10:00 AM D- 520; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMessage: Dismissal As to Defendant: County of Alameda Entered; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party County of Alameda Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service by Mail Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for California Department of Parks and Recreation; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to County of Alameda Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 12/01/2021 09:30 AM D- 520; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Celeste Bell; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less