This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 00:16:20 (UTC).

Behm-Steinberg VS California College of The Arts

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 Behm-Steinberg filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against California College of The Arts. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WINIFRED Y. SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1590

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

WINIFRED Y. SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BEHM-STEINBERG, HUGH

KENZO , ARTHUR

Defendant

CALIFORNIA COLLEGE OF THE ARTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HAMMOND, JULIAN

VARTAIN, MICHAEL J.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/11/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/11/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/22/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/22/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

6/21/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/23/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/23/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference 02/16/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

12/8/2020: Case Management Conference 02/16/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

8/11/2021: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Case Management Statement of Hugh Behm-Steinberg, Arthur Kenzo Filed

8/5/2021: Case Management Statement of Hugh Behm-Steinberg, Arthur Kenzo Filed

Proof of Service Filed

8/5/2021: Proof of Service Filed

Case Management Statement of California College of The Arts Filed

8/6/2021: Case Management Statement of California College of The Arts Filed

Association of Attorneys Filed

7/30/2021: Association of Attorneys Filed

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for California College of The Arts

7/12/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for California College of The Arts

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

7/12/2021: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

6/11/2021: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Amend Complaint Granted

4/6/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Amend Complaint Granted

First Amended Complaint Filed

4/8/2021: First Amended Complaint Filed

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Winifred Y. Smith; Department: Dept 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 11/02/2021 10:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of California College of The Arts Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Hugh Behm-Steinberg, Arthur Kenzo Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssociation of Attorneys Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Protective Orders Filed for Hugh Behm-Steinberg - (Proof of Service)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for California College of The Arts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to California College of The Arts Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to California College of The Arts Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 02/16/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 01/13/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Hugh Behm-Steinberg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA COLLEGE OF THE ARTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VARTAIN, MICHAEL J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAMMOND JULIAN