This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/22/2020 at 03:59:53 (UTC).

Baygreen, Inc. VS McClaflin

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 Baygreen, Inc filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against McClaflin. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are NOEL WISE and NOL WISE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2701

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

NOEL WISE

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AUGUSTINE, DAN

AUGUSTINE, MELISSA

BAYGREEN, INC.

Defendant

MCCLAFLIN, DOUGLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

COX, TERENCE S.

MCCORMACK, JODY T

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

6/19/2019: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Notice of Payment of Advance Jury Fee Filed

6/3/2019: Notice of Payment of Advance Jury Fee Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/3/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Proof of Service Filed

2/21/2019: Proof of Service Filed

Declaration of Demurring Party Regarding Meet and Confer Filed by Douglas McClaflin

4/2/2019: Declaration of Demurring Party Regarding Meet and Confer Filed by Douglas McClaflin

Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

4/2/2019: Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

Rejection Letter Issued on Demurrer to Complaint

4/3/2019: Rejection Letter Issued on Demurrer to Complaint

Consent to Electronic Service Filed

4/9/2019: Consent to Electronic Service Filed

Opposition and Motion to Strike Filed

4/12/2019: Opposition and Motion to Strike Filed

Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Defendant

4/18/2019: Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Defendant

Reply to Opposition to Demurrer Filed

4/18/2019: Reply to Opposition to Demurrer Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

4/25/2019: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion to Strike Complaint - Granted in Part

4/25/2019: Motion to Strike Complaint - Granted in Part

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

4/25/2019: Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Motion to Strike Filed by Douglas McClaflin

5/14/2019: Motion to Strike Filed by Douglas McClaflin

Demurrer Filed by Douglas McClaflin

5/14/2019: Demurrer Filed by Douglas McClaflin

Initial Case Management Conference 06/03/2019 09:00 AM D- 24

1/16/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 06/03/2019 09:00 AM D- 24

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

1/16/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Motion to Strike 09/19/2019 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Motion for CCP 128.7 Sanctions 09/19/2019 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Demurrer 09/19/2019 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Nol Wise; Department: Dept 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 12/13/2019 09:01 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketReferred to Private Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 01/24/2020 10:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Demurring Party Regarding Meet and Confer Filed by Douglas McClaflin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Motion for Sanctions 06/06/2019 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketMotion for Sanctions Reservation Set for dept: 24 date: 05/16/2019 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Douglas McClaflin Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/03/2019 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Fraud Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Baygreen, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less