This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:49:52 (UTC).

Bay Quality Motors VS Sam's Complete Auto Care Inc

Case Summary

On 08/06/2019 Bay Quality Motors filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Sam's Complete Auto Care Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PATRICK R. MCKINNEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0166

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

PATRICK R. MCKINNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

BAY QUALITY MOTORS

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

SAM'S COMPLETE AUTO CARE INC

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

10/17/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

10/17/2019: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

10/17/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

10/17/2019: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

10/17/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

Judgment Entered

10/17/2019: Judgment Entered

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

8/6/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Patrick R. McKinney; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Contested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 10/17/2019 09:00 AM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 10/17/2019 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 10/17/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less