This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/25/2021 at 09:10:21 (UTC).

Bay City Mechanical, Incorpor VS Balfour Beatty Construction

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Bay City Mechanical, Incorpor filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Balfour Beatty Construction. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8006

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAY CITY MECHANICAL, INCORPORATED

Defendants

BALFOUR BEATTY CONSTRUCTION, LLC

TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND

HAYWARD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LAST JR., WILLIAM C.

 

Court Documents

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

10/27/2020: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bay City Mechanical, Incorporated

10/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bay City Mechanical, Incorporated

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

10/27/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

10/30/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 03/11/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

10/30/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 03/11/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

12/21/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

12/16/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland Filed

12/3/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Hayward Unified School District Filed

12/3/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Hayward Unified School District Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Balfour Beatty Construction, LLC Filed

12/3/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Balfour Beatty Construction, LLC Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company Filed

12/3/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Filed

12/3/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Zurich American Insurance Company Filed

12/3/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Zurich American Insurance Company Filed

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Hayward Unified School District Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Balfour Beatty Construction, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Zurich American Insurance Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 03/11/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bay City Mechanical, Incorporated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAY CITY MECHANICAL, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where HAYWARD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where BALFOUR BEATTY CONSTRUCTION LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant