This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/21/2021 at 09:37:36 (UTC).

Bay Area Clergy Cases

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Bay Area Clergy Cases was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WINIFRED Y. SMITH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5114

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

WINIFRED Y. SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOE 75, JOHN

DOE SF 1013, JOHN

DOE 1014, JOHN

DOE SR. 1021, JOHN

STONEBRAKER, KATHLEEN

S., J.

DOE 1009, JOHN

BROGAN, JAMES

DOE 1008, JOHN

LOPEZ, MICHAEL

DOE 1017, JOHN

BARNES, BRIAN

DOE MR 1006, JOHN

Defendants

THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO

DOE 2

DOE 1, A CALIFORNIA COPORATION SOLE

ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF OAKLAND COPORATION SOLE

THE PARISH OF SANTA PAULA

ST. RAYMOND'S CTHOLIC CHURCH

DOE 1, A RELIGIOUS CORPORATION SOLE

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ANDREWS, ANNE

AUMAIS, CHRISTOPHER T.

BLEASE, JEFFREY R

RECK, MICHAEL

GASPARI, PAUL E.

MONTEVIDEO, JOHN A.

ZALKIN ESQ, IRWIN M.

MORAN, ADRIENNE M.

SCOTT, ERIKA J

GEORGE, JOSEPH C.

ALEXANDER, MARY E.

VAN BLOIS, R. LEWIS

SIMONS, RICHARD J.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conf Continuance 10/13/2020 10:00 AM D- 21

9/23/2020: Case Management Conf Continuance 10/13/2020 10:00 AM D- 21

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/13/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/13/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Attendance Sheet Filed

10/13/2020: Attendance Sheet Filed

Attendance Sheet Filed

10/13/2020: Attendance Sheet Filed

Order to Coordinate Filed

7/27/2020: Order to Coordinate Filed

Declaration of Michael Reck Re: the Status of Proof of Filing and Service of Additional Notices of S

7/27/2020: Declaration of Michael Reck Re: the Status of Proof of Filing and Service of Additional Notices of S

Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

7/27/2020: Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

7/27/2020: Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

7/27/2020: Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

7/27/2020: Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

7/27/2020: Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

7/27/2020: Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

7/27/2020: Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

7/27/2020: Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

7/27/2020: Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

7/27/2020: Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

7/27/2020: Notice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Denying Petition To Coordinate Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Winifred Y. Smith; Department: Dept 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttendance Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttendance Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 11/17/2020 10:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Coordinate Hearing Dropped from dept: 21 date: 09/08/2020 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 10/13/2020 10:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCo-Petitioner The Roman Catholic Bishop of Oakland's Memo of Points & Auth. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission of Joint Petition for Coordination Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Michael Reck Re: the Status of Proof of Filing and Service of Additional Notices of S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Coordinate Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO, A RELIGIOUS CORPORATION SOLE is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF OAKLAND (RCBO"), A COPORATION SOLE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZALKIN ESQ, IRWIN M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORAN ADRIENNE M.