Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 18:50:46 (UTC).

BARTH VS BARTH

Case Summary

On 08/19/1999 BARTH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BARTH. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ALICE VILARDI, KAREN RODRIGUE, CHERIE T. DAVIS, PORE, DENNIS K. ROTHHAAR, PORE and JOHN HARDING, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7419

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/1999

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

ALICE VILARDI

KAREN RODRIGUE

CHERIE T. DAVIS, PORE

DENNIS K. ROTHHAAR, PORE

JOHN HARDING, PORE

 

Party Details

Petitioners

BARTH, DOROTHY

ALAMEDA COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

Respondent

BARTH, STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LENAHAN, MAUREEN K.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2008
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Alice Vilardi; Department: Dept 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2008
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial (Long Cause) - Family Law Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2008
  • DocketMinutes: Order to Show Cause re Modification; Judge: Alice Vilardi; Department: Dept 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2008
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial (Long Cause) - Family Law 10/24/2008 01:30 PM D- 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2008
  • DocketOSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2008
  • DocketMinutes: Order to Show Cause re Modification; Judge: Alice Vilardi; Department: Dept 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2008
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2008
  • DocketHearing Continued to OSC - Family Law dept: 707 date: 08/12/2008 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2008
  • DocketOSC - Family Law Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2008
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/1999
  • DocketOSC - Family Law Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/1999
  • DocketSummons Filed, Date of Service: 8/25/99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/1999
  • DocketFamily Court Services Counselor Assigned to Case: JIM FIERRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/1999
  • DocketOSC - Family Law 09/09/1999 09:00 AM D-707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/1999
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause FOR CC,CV,INJ ORD,CS,SS,AFS,OTHER:TEMP EXC USE OF FAM RESIDENCE(PTNR) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/1999
  • DocketInfo: FSD NO. - #494629-A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/1999
  • DocketAction Dropped From Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/1999
  • DocketInitial Filing Form Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/1999
  • DocketSummons on Petition Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/1999
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed

    Read MoreRead Less