This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/16/2020 at 10:03:17 (UTC).

Barroso VS Datt

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 Barroso filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Datt. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4585

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARROSO, ERNESTO

Defendant

DATT, SHAWN

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

9/22/2020: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • HearingLocation: Dept 106; Action: Claim of Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 12/14/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less