This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/23/2020 at 01:35:12 (UTC).

Bank of America N.A. VS Silverado Mortgage Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 Bank of America N A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Silverado Mortgage Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3026

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant

SILVERADO MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GREENBERG, MITCHELL B.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Silverado Mortgage Corporation Filed

3/6/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Silverado Mortgage Corporation Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Silverado Mortgage Corporation Filed

6/3/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Silverado Mortgage Corporation Filed

Case Management Statement of Bank of America N.A. Filed

7/2/2020: Case Management Statement of Bank of America N.A. Filed

Tentative Case Management Order

7/13/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Silverado Mortgage Corporation Filed

12/12/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Silverado Mortgage Corporation Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 07/21/2020 03:00 PM D- 15

11/14/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 07/21/2020 03:00 PM D- 15

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

11/14/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

11/13/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bank of America N.A.

11/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bank of America N.A.

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

11/13/2019: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Bank of America N.A. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Silverado Mortgage Corporation Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party Silverado Mortgage Corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Silverado Mortgage Corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Silverado Mortgage Corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 07/21/2020 03:00 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bank of America N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENBERG MITCHELL B. ESQ.