This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/03/2020 at 03:05:34 (UTC).

Bank of America, N.A. VS Meador

Case Summary

On 12/18/2018 Bank of America, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Meador. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NOL WISE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3435

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

MEADOR, JEAN BENNIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BABILIS, NICHOLAS J

YOUNG, DUSTIN A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement Filed for Bank of America, N.A.

5/27/2020: Notice of Settlement Filed for Bank of America, N.A.

Case Management Conf Continuance 06/04/2020 09:30 AM D- 512

4/10/2020: Case Management Conf Continuance 06/04/2020 09:30 AM D- 512

Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 04/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 512

1/23/2020: Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 04/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 512

Declaration of Defendant's Counsel RE: OSC Filed

1/13/2020: Declaration of Defendant's Counsel RE: OSC Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/14/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/14/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Jean Bennie Meador Filed

1/2/2020: Case Management Statement of Jean Bennie Meador Filed

Case Management Statement of Bank of America, N.A. Filed

12/16/2019: Case Management Statement of Bank of America, N.A. Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/18/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/18/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Bank of America, N.A. Filed

11/12/2019: Case Management Statement of Bank of America, N.A. Filed

Case Management Statement of Jean Bennie Meador Filed

11/4/2019: Case Management Statement of Jean Bennie Meador Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/4/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/19/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/21/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bank of America, N.A.

12/18/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bank of America, N.A.

Complaint - Collections Filed

12/18/2018: Complaint - Collections Filed

Declaration Re Venue Filed

12/18/2018: Declaration Re Venue Filed

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 512; Action: Compliance Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance Hearing Dropped from dept: 512 date: 06/04/2020 time: 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 01/27/2022 09:00 AM D- 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Filed for Bank of America, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Hearing Dropped from dept: 512 date: 04/23/2020 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 06/04/2020 09:30 AM D- 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Administrative Transfer of Case Within County (Same Jurisdiction) to Hayward Hall of Justi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 04/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Nol Wise; Department: Dept 24

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 07/15/2019 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 07/08/2019 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial To Complaint Filed for Jean Bennie Meador

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Jean Bennie Meador Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot Found or Non Service Return Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Re Venue Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Collections Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bank of America, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less