Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 01:39:08 (UTC).

Banerjee VS Chi

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 Banerjee filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Chi. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DELBERT C. GEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0839

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

DELBERT C. GEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANERJEE, SHUBHLAXMI

BANERJEE, ABHIJAN

Defendants

CHI , DELPHINE

CHI, MICHAEL CHEN-WEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LONG, SCOTT D.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/24/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/24/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/12/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/12/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

9/21/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - For Judment Reforming Grant Deed

10/9/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - For Judment Reforming Grant Deed

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

10/27/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

12/28/2020: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Application Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Filed for Abhijan Banerjee, Shubhlaxmi Banerjee

1/25/2021: Application Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Filed for Abhijan Banerjee, Shubhlaxmi Banerjee

Proof of Service Filed

1/25/2021: Proof of Service Filed

Application Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Granted

1/29/2021: Application Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Granted

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Michael Chen-Wen Chi Filed

5/29/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Michael Chen-Wen Chi Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Delphine Chi Filed

5/29/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Delphine Chi Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 09/24/2020 03:00 PM D- 514

5/14/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 09/24/2020 03:00 PM D- 514

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/14/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5/11/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

5/11/2020: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Abhijan Banerjee

5/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Abhijan Banerjee

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Filed for Abhijan Banerjee, Shubhlaxmi Banerjee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Delbert C. Gee; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 05/12/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRe-Notice of Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Delphine Chi Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Michael Chen-Wen Chi Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/24/2020 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Abhijan Banerjee

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LONG, SCOTT D