This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/26/2021 at 09:39:44 (UTC).

Baker VS Frazzano

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 Baker filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Frazzano. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7177

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAKER , DENNIS

BAKER , SALLY

Defendants

FRAZZANO , JOE

J. ROCKCLIFF, INC.

FRAZZANO REAL ESTATE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LEPERA, JOSEPH A.

JONES, SHANNON B.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

2/3/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 06/01/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

2/3/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 06/01/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

1/12/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Dennis Baker

1/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Dennis Baker

Complaint Fraud Filed

1/12/2021: Complaint Fraud Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Frazzano Real Estate, Inc. Filed

3/2/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Frazzano Real Estate, Inc. Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to J. Rockcliff, Inc. Filed

2/24/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to J. Rockcliff, Inc. Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Joe Frazzano Filed

3/4/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Joe Frazzano Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Joe Frazzano, Frazzano Real Estate, Inc. , J. Rockcliff, Inc.

3/24/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Joe Frazzano, Frazzano Real Estate, Inc. , J. Rockcliff, Inc.

Proof of Service on Complaint As to J. Rockcliff, Inc. Filed

2/24/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to J. Rockcliff, Inc. Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 19; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Joe Frazzano, Frazzano Real Estate, Inc. , J. Rockcliff, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Joe Frazzano Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Frazzano Real Estate, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to J. Rockcliff, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to J. Rockcliff, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/01/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Dennis Baker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Fraud Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J. ROCKCLIFF, INC., is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEPERA, JOSEPH A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jones, Shannon Ball