This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/15/2022 at 07:49:44 (UTC).

AYALA vs FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 AYALA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. James Reilly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6001

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. James Reilly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Audiel Ayala

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Kevin Jacobson

 

Court Documents

Complaint

08/11/2022: Complaint

Summons on Complaint

08/11/2022: Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

08/11/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment

08/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment

Proof of Personal Service

08/17/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Audiel Ayala (Plaintiff) As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant) Service Date: 08/16/2022 Service Cost: 30.00 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case assigned to Hon. James Reilly in Department 25 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse; Category: Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/29/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25; Category: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Case Assignment Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: Audiel Ayala (Plaintiff) As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: Audiel Ayala (Plaintiff) As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Filed by: Audiel Ayala (Plaintiff) As to: FORD MOTOR COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacobson, Kevin