Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 04:48:46 (UTC).

Ayala VS Dyck O'Neal, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 Ayala filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Dyck O'Neal, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7205

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AYALA, HUGO

ZAVALA, AMANDA

Defendants

ALDRIDGE PITE, LLP

CLEAR RECON, CORP,

DYCK O'NEAL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ESTAVILLO, JASON W.

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Aldridge Pite, LLP Filed

6/25/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Aldridge Pite, LLP Filed

Dismissal As to Defendant: Aldridge Pite, LLP Entered

7/6/2021: Dismissal As to Defendant: Aldridge Pite, LLP Entered

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Clear Recon, Corp, Filed

5/25/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Clear Recon, Corp, Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Aldridge Pite, LLP Filed

5/25/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Aldridge Pite, LLP Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Dyck O'Neal, Inc. Filed

5/25/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Dyck O'Neal, Inc. Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

4/27/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

4/27/2021: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Hugo Ayala

4/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Hugo Ayala

Notice of Lis Pendens Filed

4/27/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 09/15/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

4/29/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 09/15/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4/29/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Aldridge Pite, LLP Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Aldridge Pite, LLP Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Dyck O'Neal, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Clear Recon, Corp, Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Aldridge Pite, LLP Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/15/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Hugo Ayala

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aldridge Pite, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where DYCK-O'NEAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Clear Recon Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Estavillo, Jason Wallace