Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 07:01:50 (UTC).

Avila VS Equity Residential Management, L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 Avila filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Equity Residential Management, L L C. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9989

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AVILA , BREANNA

AVILA , ALFONSO

Defendant

EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WOLFF, ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

5/21/2021: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alfonso Avila

5/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alfonso Avila

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5/21/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 10/04/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

5/27/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 10/04/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/27/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 518; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 10/04/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alfonso Avila

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equity Residential Management LLC is a litigant