This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/07/2021 at 03:00:15 (UTC).

Au-Duong VS Tang

Case Summary

On 08/05/2019 Au-Duong filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Tang. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JO-LYNNE Q. LEE and DELBERT C. GEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9996

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

DELBERT C. GEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

AU-DUONG, LINH

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TANG, WENDY

TANG, HARRY

LAU, PAUL

FUNG, MICHAEL

PINNACLE FUNDING CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LAU, DANA

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC

AMWEST FUNDING CORP.

LAM, SANDRA

PINNACLE CAPITAL MORTGAGE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

YANG, NICHOLAS

DAO, LOAN

WONG, DENNIS

SHEN, STANLEY

KANE, PATRICK J

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/25/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/25/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

2/22/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/21/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/21/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

10/16/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Response in support of Pltff's Motion for Bifurcation of Trial Filed

12/2/2020: Response in support of Pltff's Motion for Bifurcation of Trial Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

7/14/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Opposition to Demurrer to the 2nd Amended Complaint Filed

6/30/2020: Opposition to Demurrer to the 2nd Amended Complaint Filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed

7/6/2020: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/22/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Declaration Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Delbert C. Gee Filed for Michael Fung - Of Stanley Shen I

3/11/2020: Declaration Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Delbert C. Gee Filed for Michael Fung - Of Stanley Shen I

Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

2/26/2020: Proof of Service on Amended Complaint Filed

Returned Mail: Notice of Reassignment of Judge Filed

12/23/2019: Returned Mail: Notice of Reassignment of Judge Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/16/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Opposition to Mtn to Strike Filed

1/6/2020: Opposition to Mtn to Strike Filed

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/16/2020 08:30 AM D- 514

12/11/2019: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/16/2020 08:30 AM D- 514

Declaration ISO Opposition Filed

10/23/2019: Declaration ISO Opposition Filed

142 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Order After Hearing RE: Defendant's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Judge: Delbert C. Gee; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Preliminary Injunction Taken Under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Delbert C. Gee; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 05/28/2021 02:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Motion for Preliminary Injunction 03/03/2021 01:30 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
170 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer to Complaint Filed by Wendy Tang, Harry Tang

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketMotion to Strike Hearing Confirmed for 12/12/2019 03:00 PM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike Filed by Harry Tang, Wendy Tang

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Harry Tang Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Wendy Tang Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/18/2019 03:00 PM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Linh Au-Duong

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEN, STANLEY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAO, LOAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick J Kane