Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/04/2021 at 04:11:52 (UTC).

Arditto VS Autozone, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2019 Arditto filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Autozone, INC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRAD SELIGMAN and JO-LYNNE Q. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4481

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

BRAD SELIGMAN

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARDITTO, CHRISTIAN D

ARDITTO, CHRISTINA G

Defendants

AUTOZONE, INC.

BRIGGS & STRATTON CORPORATION

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC

BWDAC, INC

KELLY MORE PAINT COMPANY, INC

THE DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

METALCLAD INSULATION, LLC

TECUMSEH PRODUCTS COMPANY

THE PEP BOYS- MANY MOE Y&JACK OF CALIFORNIA

SHELL CATALYSTS & TECHNOLOGIES LP

SOCO WEST, INC

WYETH HOLDINGS, LLC

TORRO COMPANY

O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES, LLC

AUTOZONE WEST, LLC

TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA, INC

THE SIGNAL COMPANIES INC.

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

UCHIMURA, MARISSA Y.

LOVE, MARK A

OBERG, LISA L.

MCCORMICK, JENNIFER M.

FRAENKEL ESQ, CONSTANCE

LAZARUS ESQ, LISA H

HUGO, EDWARD R.

PETTY, ROSS M.

MANOLI, C.J.

HODGSON, CRAIG L

WERTZ, R. RANDY

STROTZ, PETER A.

ONGARO, DAVID R

JACKSON, MICHELLE C.

GLASPY, DAVID M

RIDLEY, SHAWN M.

BAILEY, BOBBIE R.

DAVIS, GEOFFREY

DUFFY, JOSEPH

WARREN, SHELDON J.

14 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/5/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/5/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

1/23/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/6/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/6/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

10/31/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Association of Attorneys Filed

4/1/2021: Association of Attorneys Filed

Case Management Statement of Designated Defense Counsel Filed

1/21/2021: Case Management Statement of Designated Defense Counsel Filed

Case Management Statement of Christina G Arditto, Christian D Arditto Filed

1/21/2021: Case Management Statement of Christina G Arditto, Christian D Arditto Filed

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Amcord, Inc.

12/21/2020: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Amcord, Inc.

Answer to Amended Complaint Filed for WYETH HOLDINGS, LLC

12/11/2020: Answer to Amended Complaint Filed for WYETH HOLDINGS, LLC

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Pump Enginerring Company

12/15/2020: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Pump Enginerring Company

Answer to Amended Complaint Filed for Gardner Denver, Inc.

12/17/2020: Answer to Amended Complaint Filed for Gardner Denver, Inc.

Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

10/23/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for Pacific Mechanical Supply

5/22/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment Filed for Pacific Mechanical Supply

Answer to Complaint Filed for Amcord, Inc.

2/4/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Amcord, Inc.

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

2/5/2020: Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

10/23/2019: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

280 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 18; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 18; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketMotion to Quash Hearing Dropped from dept: 18 date: 05/07/2021 time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketMotion to Quash Hearing Dropped from dept: 18 date: 05/07/2021 time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Motion to Quash off Calendar Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Motion to Quash off Calendar Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Amended Complaint Filed for Cytec Industries, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Amended Complaint Filed for Cytec Industries, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
629 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder re Case Management Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Re Designated Defense Counsel Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Fact Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 10/25/2019 09:15 AM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Asbestos Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Christina G Arditto

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TORRO COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where TECUMSEH PRODUCTS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where THE SIGNAL COMPANIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant