This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/25/2020 at 03:14:32 (UTC).

Apoyo Financiero, Inc. VS Gonzalez Beltran

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 Apoyo Financiero, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Gonzalez Beltran. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FRANK ROESCH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0514

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

FRANK ROESCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

APOYO FINANCIERO, INC.

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

GONZALEZ BELTRAN , LUIS ANDRES

 

Court Documents

Memo of Costs Filed for Apoyo Financiero, Inc.

10/18/2019: Memo of Costs Filed for Apoyo Financiero, Inc.

Returned Mail: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

8/20/2019: Returned Mail: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

8/9/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

8/2/2019: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

8/6/2019: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Judgment Entered

8/6/2019: Judgment Entered

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

5/28/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued To Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo of Costs Filed for Apoyo Financiero, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Frank Roesch; Department: Dept 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Uncontested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 08/06/2019 09:00 AM D- 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 08/06/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less