This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 01/16/2021 at 14:03:33 (UTC).

Anye VS Perez

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 Anye filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Perez. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DELBERT C. GEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2703

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

DELBERT C. GEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANYE, BERNARD

Defendant

PEREZ, ROBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

OWENS, MARQUIS D.

SMITH, MICHAEL J.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/21/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

7/2/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

5/21/2020: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/21/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Roberto Perez Filed

2/26/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Roberto Perez Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Roberto Perez Filed

2/26/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Roberto Perez Filed

Response to Order to Show Cause RE: Filing of Answer and Filing of Proof of Service Filed

3/2/2020: Response to Order to Show Cause RE: Filing of Answer and Filing of Proof of Service Filed

Case Management Statement of Bernard Anye Filed

3/2/2020: Case Management Statement of Bernard Anye Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Roberto Perez

3/4/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Roberto Perez

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/5/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of Bernard Anye Filed

1/3/2020: Case Management Statement of Bernard Anye Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/9/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

8/23/2019: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bernard Anye

8/23/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bernard Anye

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

8/23/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

8/28/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Delbert C. Gee; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Compliance Hearing; Judge: Delbert C. Gee; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 07/21/2020 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Bernard Anye Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 01/09/2020 08:30 AM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 01/08/2020 03:00 PM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Bernard Anye Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Bernard Anye

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bernard Anye

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OWENS, MARQUIS D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, MICHAEL L.