This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 01:58:58 (UTC).

Andreychak VS Alcoa

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 Andreychak filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Alcoa. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0227

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

HENRY COMPANY LLC

PLANT PRODUCTS & SUPPLY COMPANY

BAY CITY MARINE, INC.

UNIION CARBIDE CORPORATION

CRANE CO.

ALCOA

CDH METALS

PETRIE PLUMBING INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

CP KELCO U.S., INC.

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

LTV STEEL COMPANY, INC.

KELCO COMPANY

INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY

ARECELORMITTAL USA, INC.

TECHNO CORPORATION

HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Alice Wong

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Case Management Order Filed

8/16/2021: Notice of Entry of Case Management Order Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/6/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/6/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

8/3/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Tentative Case Management Order

7/29/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/30/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/30/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

4/23/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference 04/30/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

3/3/2021: Case Management Conference 04/30/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

Tentative Case Management Order

05/21/2022: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Statement

05/12/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

05/12/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

03/29/2022: Request for Dismissal

Order STIPULATION AND ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

03/14/2022: Order STIPULATION AND ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Stipulation and Order AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

03/01/2022: Stipulation and Order AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Substitution of Attorney

03/04/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

03/01/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Notice Notice of Remote Appearance

02/28/2022: Notice Notice of Remote Appearance

222 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Edwin Andreychak (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Alcoa (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketMessage: On the Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by Edwin Andreychak on 12/20/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Edwin Andreychak as to Hopeman Brothers, Inc.; Category: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMessage: On the Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by Edwin Andreychak on 12/20/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Edwin Andreychak as to Hopeman Brothers, Inc.; Category: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketMessage: Request for Dismissal Filed and Received by: Edwin Andreychak (Plaintiff) As to: Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order STIPULATION AND ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketMessage: Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Bay City Marine, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketMessage: Stipulation and Order AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE Filed and Received by: Uniion Carbide Corporation (Defendant) As to: Uniion Carbide Corporation (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by: Edwin Andreychak (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice Notice of Remote Appearance Filed by: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Defendant) As to: Edwin Andreychak (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
130 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMessage: PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET NEW FILING - ASBESTOS LITIGATION Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMessage: Order RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMessage: Order INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference 04/30/2021 09:00 AM D- 18; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Demand for Jury Trial Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Requested; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Edwin Andreychak; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Asbestos Filed (Amended); Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less