This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 02:35:16 (UTC).

Andrews VS Cyprus Amax Minerals Company

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 Andrews filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Cyprus Amax Minerals Company. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JO-LYNNE Q. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8692

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDREWS, ATHENA

ANDREWS, CHARLES

ANDREWS, JEANIE M.

ANDREWS, LAKEENBA

Defendants and Others

CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY

FMC CORPORATION

H.M. ROYAL OF CALIFORNIA

H.M. ROYAL, INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

MCNEIL (OHIO) CORPORATION

METALCLAD INSULATION, LLC

OWL CONTRACTORS

PARKER HANNIFAN CORPORATION

PFIZER, INC.

RED SEAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

STANDARS MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC.

THE DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

THE PEP BOYS

VANDERBUILT MINERALS LLC

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

AMELL, DAVID L.

TAVERA, LEONARD M.

KAPLAN, BRADLEY P.

POND, FRANK D.

SPANOS, EVANTHIA M

OBERG, LISA L.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/1/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/1/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

9/23/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Order INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

8/13/2021: Order INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

Case Management Conference 10/01/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

8/18/2021: Case Management Conference 10/01/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for The Pep Boys

10/6/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for The Pep Boys

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Metalclad Insulation, LLC

10/6/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Metalclad Insulation, LLC

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

10/6/2021: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

10/6/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Vanderbuilt Minerals LLC

9/29/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Vanderbuilt Minerals LLC

Case Management Statement of Designated Defense Counsel Filed

9/17/2021: Case Management Statement of Designated Defense Counsel Filed

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for FMC Corporation

9/29/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for FMC Corporation

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

9/29/2021: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Standars Motor Products, Inc.

9/22/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Standars Motor Products, Inc.

First Amended Complaint Filed

9/1/2021: First Amended Complaint Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued

9/1/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued

Complex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

8/13/2021: Complex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

Order RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed

8/13/2021: Order RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 18; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Metalclad Insulation, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for The Pep Boys

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDemurrer to Complaint Hearing Dropped from dept: 18 date: 10/29/2021 time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Jo-Lynne Q. Lee; Department: Dept 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 01/07/2022 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder RE DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Designation Order - Case Ruled Complex Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET NEW FILING - ASBESTOS LITIGATION Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jeanie M. Andrews

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Asbestos Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCNEIL (OHIO) CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HM Royal Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where THE DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY is a litigant