This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/24/2022 at 00:28:24 (UTC).

Andrews VS Alameda County

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 Andrews filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Tara Desautels. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6094

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Tara Desautels

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Scott Andrews

Defendants

ALAMEDA COUNTY

ALAMEDA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

Deputy Jordan Sanders

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

David T. Duncan

Timothy Patrick Murphy

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 12/06/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

7/23/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 12/06/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

Case Management Statement

05/18/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

05/12/2022: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

05/06/2022: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Notice of Case Reassignment

05/04/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment

Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Protective Order

03/24/2022: Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Protective Order

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

02/25/2022: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Notice of Case Reassignment

01/04/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment

Order re: Initial Case Management Conference

12/06/2021: Order re: Initial Case Management Conference

Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)

12/06/2021: Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)

Case Management Statement

11/24/2021: Case Management Statement

Demand for Jury Trial

11/24/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Case Reassignment

11/22/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment

Case Management Statement

11/18/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

10/13/2021: Answer

Declaration in Support Request|

08/03/2021: Declaration in Support Request|

Proposed Order Request|

08/03/2021: Proposed Order Request|

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alameda County Sheriff's Office Filed

09/23/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alameda County Sheriff's Office Filed

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: David Scott Andrews (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/02/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 16 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/13/2022 09:00 AM; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case reassigned to Rene C. Davidson Courthouse in Department 16 - Hon. Tara Desautelseffective 05/09/2022Reason: Inventory Transfer; Category: Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/02/2022 at 01:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 517 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 06/02/2022 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 16; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Case Reassignment Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Protective Order: Result: Granted Result Date: 03/24/2022; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Protective Order: Status Date changed from 03/14/2022 to 03/24/2022 Status changed from Filed and Received to Signed and Filed; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketMessage: Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Protective Order Filed and Received by: Alameda County (Defendant); Alameda County Sheriff's Office (Defendant); Deputy Jordan Sanders (Defendant) As to: David Scott Andrews (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Alameda County Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Dennis Hayashi Granted; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketMessage: Declaration in Support Request|; Category: DCL020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proposed Order Request|; Category: ZZZ002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Dennis Hayashi Filed for David Scott Andrews; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 12/06/2021 02:30 PM D- 518; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for David Scott Andrews; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALAMEDA COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where ALAMEDA COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy P Murphy