This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 06:16:00 (UTC).

Anderson VS Zaheri

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 Anderson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Zaheri. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4663

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDERSON, LASHONDA

Defendant

ZAHERI, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SADR, KASRA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

10/6/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 02/22/2022 03:00 PM D- 15

10/6/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 02/22/2022 03:00 PM D- 15

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lashonda Anderson

10/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lashonda Anderson

Complaint - Other Contract Filed

10/4/2021: Complaint - Other Contract Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

10/4/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 15; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 02/22/2022 03:00 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lashonda Anderson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Contract Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SADR KASRA