Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 14:04:58 (UTC).

ANDERSON VS ANDERSON

Case Summary

On 11/22/1993 ANDERSON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ANDERSON. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JACOB BLEA III and ARLENE KOCK, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7306

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/1993

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JACOB BLEA III

ARLENE KOCK, PORE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANDERSON, JACQUELINE

Respondent

ANDERSON, STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LORENTZEN, PAULA A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketEntire case imaged so as to preserve the record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2004
  • DocketFindings and Order After Hearing re Child Support,.. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2004
  • DocketOrder/Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2004
  • DocketFindings and Order After Hearing re Child Support,.. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2004
  • DocketLetter re sending order without opp. signature dated 5-11-04 Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2004
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability of Counsel Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2004
  • DocketMinutes: Order to Show Cause re Modification; Judge: Jacob Blea III; Department: Dept 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2004
  • DocketMiscellaneous DissoMaster printout Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2004
  • DocketOSC - Family Law Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Order to Show Cause re Modification As to STEVEN ANDERSON Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/1994
  • DocketOSC - Family Law 11/18/1994 09:00 AM D-50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/1994
  • DocketOSC - Family Law Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/1994
  • DocketFamily Court Services Counselor Assigned to Case: BILLIE MCVAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/1994
  • DocketResponse FILED, FEE PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/1994
  • DocketOSC - Family Law 09/20/1994 09:00 AM D-50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/1994
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause RE: CC, CV, CS, SS, AF/COSTS, INJ ORDERS (PTNR) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/1994
  • DocketAmended Petition FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/1993
  • DocketInitial Filing Form Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/1993
  • DocketSummons on Petition Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/1993
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Female Filed

    Read MoreRead Less