Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/13/2020 at 01:27:48 (UTC).

Anchor General Insurance Co. VS Fewounjeupam

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 Anchor General Insurance Co filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Fewounjeupam. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6751

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO.

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

FEWOUNJEUPAM, SOULEMANOU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LOURO, JENNY R.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

1/30/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Soulemanou Fewounjeupam Filed

9/23/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Soulemanou Fewounjeupam Filed

Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Soulemanou Fewounjeupam Filed - re Ca

10/4/2019: Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Soulemanou Fewounjeupam Filed - re Ca

Case Management Statement of Anchor General Insurance Co. Filed

10/11/2019: Case Management Statement of Anchor General Insurance Co. Filed

Judgment Default : Court per CCP 585 Declaration Filed

11/4/2019: Judgment Default : Court per CCP 585 Declaration Filed

Judgment Entered

11/4/2019: Judgment Entered

Case Management Statement of Anchor General Insurance Co. Filed

8/9/2019: Case Management Statement of Anchor General Insurance Co. Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/4/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 09/11/2019 09:00 AM D- 24

4/30/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 09/11/2019 09:00 AM D- 24

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4/30/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Anchor General Insurance Co.

4/29/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Anchor General Insurance Co.

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

4/29/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

4/29/2019: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Declaration of Venue Filed

4/29/2019: Declaration of Venue Filed

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Default : Court per CCP 585 Declaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Anchor General Insurance Co. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketDefault Entered as to Soulemanou Fewounjeupam. Judgment Routed to Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Soulemanou Fewounjeupam Filed - re Ca

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Soulemanou Fewounjeupam Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/13/2019 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Anchor General Insurance Co. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/11/2019 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Anchor General Insurance Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Anchor General Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOURO JENNY ROSE