This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 07:22:03 (UTC).

Amguard Insurance Company VS Pacific States Petroleum, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 Amguard Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Pacific States Petroleum, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1835

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

AGGREKO, LLC

PACIFIC STATES PETROLEUM, INC.

TOUCH WORLDWIDE

MIX, LEONARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LEACH, BRIAN

NEVIS, CHRISTOPHER J.

SHAW, PAULA M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

3/17/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 07/27/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

3/17/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 07/27/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

3/12/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Amguard Insurance Company

3/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Amguard Insurance Company

Complaint - Insurance Coverage Filed

3/12/2021: Complaint - Insurance Coverage Filed

Order to Consolidate Cases Filed

7/2/2021: Order to Consolidate Cases Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Aggreko, LLC

7/1/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Aggreko, LLC

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

5/27/2021: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Pacific States Petroleum, Inc.

5/27/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Pacific States Petroleum, Inc.

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Aggreko, LLC Filed

5/19/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Aggreko, LLC Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Pacific States Petroleum, Inc. Filed

5/12/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Pacific States Petroleum, Inc. Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 19 date: 07/27/2021 time: 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Consolidate Cases Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Aggreko, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Pacific States Petroleum, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Aggreko, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Pacific States Petroleum, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 07/27/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Insurance Coverage Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Amguard Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aggreko, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC STATES PETROLEUM INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leach, Brian