This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/29/2022 at 18:00:18 (UTC).

American General Financial Services, Inc. VS Nabizada

Case Summary

On 06/19/2009 American General Financial Services, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Nabizada. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Thomas Rasch. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8637

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Thomas Rasch

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Defendant

Beishta Nabizada

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Todd L. Cramer

 

Court Documents

Proposed Judgment Request

08/17/2009: Proposed Judgment Request

Declaration Other: Request Cover Sheet for Proof of Debt

08/17/2009: Declaration Other: Request Cover Sheet for Proof of Debt

Limited Collections Order

01/27/2011: Limited Collections Order

Compliance Hearing 01/27/2011 09:01 AM D- 31

07/01/2010: Compliance Hearing 01/27/2011 09:01 AM D- 31

OEX - Dropped - Neither Side Appearing

04/28/2010: OEX - Dropped - Neither Side Appearing

Hearing Reset to Order of Examination 04/28/2010 05:30 PM D- 604

04/08/2010: Hearing Reset to Order of Examination 04/28/2010 05:30 PM D- 604

Notice of Bankruptcy As to Defendant Beishta Nabizada

03/09/2010: Notice of Bankruptcy As to Defendant Beishta Nabizada

Rejection Letter Issued on Bench Warrant

01/12/2010: Rejection Letter Issued on Bench Warrant

Rejection Letter Issued on Bench Warrant

12/22/2009: Rejection Letter Issued on Bench Warrant

OEX - Bench Warrant ordered for $500

12/10/2009: OEX - Bench Warrant ordered for $500

Proof of Service Order of Examination Filed

12/01/2009: Proof of Service Order of Examination Filed

Civil Order of Examination Issued

10/09/2009: Civil Order of Examination Issued

Judgment Entered judgment granted and entered

09/21/2009: Judgment Entered judgment granted and entered

Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed Filing request for default 585 judgment

09/04/2009: Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed Filing request for default 585 judgment

Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) Rejected Rejection of Default Judgment Request

08/28/2009: Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) Rejected Rejection of Default Judgment Request

Declaration in Support of Judgment by Default by Court Filed

08/28/2009: Declaration in Support of Judgment by Default by Court Filed

Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Beishta Nabizada Filed Request for Clerk Judgment (Money)

08/17/2009: Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Beishta Nabizada Filed Request for Clerk Judgment (Money)

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Beishta Nabizada Filed

08/17/2009: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Beishta Nabizada Filed

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2013
  • DocketMessage: Paper File Destroyed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • DocketMessage: Limited Collections Order; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • DocketMessage: Compliance Hearing 01/27/2011 09:01 AM D- 31; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • DocketMessage: OEX - Dropped - Neither Side Appearing; Category: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • DocketMessage: Hearing Reset to Order of Examination 04/28/2010 05:30 PM D- 604; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • DocketMessage: Order of Examination 04/28/2010 05:30 PM D- 604; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • DocketMessage: Bench Warrant returned with Proof of Service Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2010
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Bankruptcy As to Defendant Beishta Nabizada; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2010
  • DocketMessage: Notes: BW forwarded to sheriff; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2010
  • DocketMessage: Rejection Letter Issued on Bench Warrant; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2009
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) Rejected; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2009
  • DocketMessage: Declaration in Support of Judgment by Default by Court Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2009
  • DocketMessage: Proposed Judgment Request; Category: ZZZ005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2009
  • DocketMessage: Declaration Other: Request Cover Sheet for Proof of Debt; Category: DCL011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2009
  • DocketMessage: Default Entered as to Beishta Nabizada. Judgment Routed to Judge; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2009
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Default and Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) As To Beishta Nabizada Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2009
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Beishta Nabizada Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for American General Financial Services, Inc.; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Collections Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL SERVICES INC SBM is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRAMER TODD LOREN