This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 11:12:16 (UTC).

American Express National Bank VS Salimi

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 American Express National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Salimi. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5483

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

SALIMI, SOLAIMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DYLE, SCOTT D

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Solaiman Salimi Filed

6/4/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Solaiman Salimi Filed

Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Solaiman Salimi Filed

8/16/2021: Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Solaiman Salimi Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

3/29/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for American Express National Bank

3/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for American Express National Bank

Complaint - Collections Filed

3/29/2021: Complaint - Collections Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDefault Entered as to Solaiman Salimi. Judgment Routed to Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As To Solaiman Salimi Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Solaiman Salimi Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Collections Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DYLE SCOTT D.