Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/09/2021 at 04:00:27 (UTC).

American Express National Bank VS Prusiensky

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 American Express National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Prusiensky. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DELBERT C. GEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9690

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

DELBERT C. GEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

PRUSIENSKY, PAUL S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

THRUSH, CHYANNA

 

Court Documents

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 11/12/2020 03:00 PM D- 514

6/26/2020: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 11/12/2020 03:00 PM D- 514

Returned Mail: Notice of Case Management Conference Filed

7/6/2020: Returned Mail: Notice of Case Management Conference Filed

Judgment Entire Action Filed

2/5/2021: Judgment Entire Action Filed

Judgment Entered

2/5/2021: Judgment Entered

Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

2/5/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

Proposed Judgment Received

1/15/2021: Proposed Judgment Received

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Paul S Prusiensky Filed

6/10/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Paul S Prusiensky Filed

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for American Express National Bank

7/23/2020: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for American Express National Bank

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed for Plaintiff

7/23/2020: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed for Plaintiff

Notice of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed

8/17/2020: Notice of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

9/8/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Returned Mail: Notice of Motion Filed

9/25/2020: Returned Mail: Notice of Motion Filed

Returned Mail: Notice of Reassignment of Judge for All Purposes Filed

3/27/2020: Returned Mail: Notice of Reassignment of Judge for All Purposes Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Paul S Prusiensky

2/14/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Paul S Prusiensky

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

3/16/2020: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 11/10/2020 03:00 PM D- 15

1/10/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 11/10/2020 03:00 PM D- 15

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

1/10/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Complaint - Collections Filed

1/9/2020: Complaint - Collections Filed

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entire Action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Judgment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 514 date: 11/12/2020 time: 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Notice of Motion Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Judge: Delbert C. Gee; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Judgment on the Pleadings Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Notice of Reassignment of Judge for All Purposes Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Paul S Prusiensky Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Paul S Prusiensky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Paul S Prusiensky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/10/2020 03:00 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Collections Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THRUSH CHYANNA ESQ.