This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/04/2021 at 09:03:14 (UTC).

American Express National Bank VS Frye

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 American Express National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Frye. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5410

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

FRYE , CHRISTOPHE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DYLE, SCOTT D

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Diligence Filed

2/18/2021: Declaration of Diligence Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

1/4/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for American Express National Bank

1/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for American Express National Bank

Complaint - Collections Filed

1/4/2021: Complaint - Collections Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Diligence Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for American Express National Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Collections Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DYLE SCOTT D.