This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 07:48:07 (UTC).

Alvarado VS Rangaraj

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Alvarado filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Rangaraj. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2532

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALVARADO, RYAN

Defendants

RANGARAJ, ARAVIND MD

ST. ROSE HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CALLAWAY, R. BOONE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

9/14/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 01/26/2022 02:30 PM D- 521

9/14/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 01/26/2022 02:30 PM D- 521

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

9/13/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ryan Alvarado

9/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ryan Alvarado

Complaint Medical Malpractice Filed

9/13/2021: Complaint Medical Malpractice Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 01/26/2022 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ryan Alvarado

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Medical Malpractice Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST. ROSE HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CALLAWAY, R. BOONE