Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 12/16/2020 at 06:58:09 (UTC).

Alqaisi VS Darke

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 Alqaisi filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Darke. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PAUL D. HERBERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1635

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

PAUL D. HERBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALQAISI, MOHMMED

Defendants

DARKE, CHRITRA

DARKE, PRAKASH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

COHEN, MICHAEL C.

GELINI, THOMAS S.

CRANE, ALISON M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement Filed for Mohmmed Alqaisi

6/26/2020: Notice of Settlement Filed for Mohmmed Alqaisi

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

8/6/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/13/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Settlement Filed for Mohmmed Alqaisi

6/26/2020: Notice of Settlement Filed for Mohmmed Alqaisi

Compliance Hearing 08/17/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

6/26/2020: Compliance Hearing 08/17/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

Notice of Disassociation of Counsel Filed

1/16/2020: Notice of Disassociation of Counsel Filed

Notice of Change of Address Filed

2/27/2020: Notice of Change of Address Filed

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/29/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

5/6/2020: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/29/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

Notice of of Jury Fee Deposit Filed

5/13/2019: Notice of of Jury Fee Deposit Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/29/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

4/10/2019: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Association of Attorneys Filed

3/29/2019: Association of Attorneys Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Prakash Darke, Chritra Darke

2/25/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Prakash Darke, Chritra Darke

Notice of Change of Address Filed

12/31/2018: Notice of Change of Address Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 04/29/2019 03:00 PM D- 20

12/13/2018: Initial Case Management Conference 04/29/2019 03:00 PM D- 20

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

12/13/2018: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

12/11/2018: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

12/11/2018: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Filed for Mohmmed Alqaisi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 08/17/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial Hearing Dropped from dept: 20 date: 08/03/2020 time: 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance Hearing Dropped from dept: 20 date: 07/22/2020 time: 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Filed for Mohmmed Alqaisi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Case Management Conf Continuance 06/29/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 303 date: 06/29/2020 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Mohmmed Alqaisi Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssociation of Attorneys Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Prakash Darke, Chritra Darke

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/29/2019 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Mohmmed Alqaisi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GELINI, THOMAS S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHEN, MICHAEL C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRANE, ALISON M.