This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/07/2020 at 11:06:45 (UTC).

Alcaraz VS Altezza Condo,LLC

Case Summary

On 01/26/2018 Alcaraz filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Altezza Condo,LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FRANK ROESCH, JO-LYNNE Q. LEE, NOEL WISE and NOL WISE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0767

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

FRANK ROESCH

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

NOEL WISE

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Debtor / Appellee

ALCARAZ, BERNARDO

Defendant and Other

ALTEZZA CONDO,LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BROWN, MARCUS T

MILLER, MICHAEL G.

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 06/11/2018 09:00 AM D- 24

1/29/2018: Initial Case Management Conference 06/11/2018 09:00 AM D- 24

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/11/2018: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/11/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Order from DCA Filed

1/8/2020: Order from DCA Filed

Order from DCA Filed

8/8/2019: Order from DCA Filed

Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens Granted

7/25/2019: Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens Granted

Notification of Filing Notice of Appeal Issued

5/28/2019: Notification of Filing Notice of Appeal Issued

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

5/30/2019: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

4/19/2019: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

Letter from Filed

4/5/2019: Letter from Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

3/28/2019: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

1/8/2019: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Granted

1/8/2019: Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Granted

Declaration in Support tp Filed

11/9/2018: Declaration in Support tp Filed

Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

9/6/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

1/26/2018: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

4/16/2018: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

5/31/2018: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

124 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRemittitur Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBilling Notice Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder from DCA Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Designating Record on Appeal by Debtor Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Default Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt for Notice of Appeal by DCA Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appeal Filed by Bernardo Alcaraz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed for Altezza Condo,LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
167 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Consolidate Filed for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketCivil Ex-Parte 02/06/2018 04:00 PM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Stay Filed for Bernardo Alcaraz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketOther Ex Parte Reservation Set for dept: 24 date: 02/06/2018 time: 04:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/11/2018 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bernardo Alcaraz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less