This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/22/2021 at 05:46:44 (UTC).

Alaska National Insurance Com VS Mediterranean Shipping Comp

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 Alaska National Insurance Com filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mediterranean Shipping Comp. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PULIDO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4714

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN PULIDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALASKA NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

JOLLY, ARUN KUMAR

MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY (USA), INC., A NEW YORK CORPORATION

THREE RIVERS TRUCKING, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

THREE HARBORS SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

JAVAN, ROBERT B.

TONG, DAVID A

DOMINGUEZ, DARIN R.

NAKAGAWA, EDWIN S.

HOME III, W. STUART

DELGADO, BRYAN R.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/22/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/22/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/12/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/12/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Settlement Filed for Alaska National Insurance Company

2/5/2021: Notice of Settlement Filed for Alaska National Insurance Company

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

3/23/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Case Management Statement of Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA), Inc., a New York corporation File

1/13/2020: Case Management Statement of Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA), Inc., a New York corporation File

Case Management Statement of Alaska National Insurance Company Filed

2/8/2021: Case Management Statement of Alaska National Insurance Company Filed

Case Management Statement of Alaska National Insurance Company Filed

10/27/2020: Case Management Statement of Alaska National Insurance Company Filed

Case Management Statement of Arun Kumar Jolly Filed

10/28/2020: Case Management Statement of Arun Kumar Jolly Filed

Case Management Statement of Three Rivers Trucking, Inc. A California corporation Filed

10/28/2020: Case Management Statement of Three Rivers Trucking, Inc. A California corporation Filed

Case Management Statement of Three Rivers Trucking, Inc. A California corporation Filed

6/4/2020: Case Management Statement of Three Rivers Trucking, Inc. A California corporation Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Three Harbors Services, Inc.

7/22/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Three Harbors Services, Inc.

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/9/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/9/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Amendment to Complaint Filed

5/26/2020: Amendment to Complaint Filed

Case Management Statement of Alaska National Insurance Company Filed

5/26/2020: Case Management Statement of Alaska National Insurance Company Filed

Case Management Statement of Arun Kumar Jolly Filed

5/28/2020: Case Management Statement of Arun Kumar Jolly Filed

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 06/07/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Alaska National Insurance Company Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Filed for Alaska National Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 02/22/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Arun Kumar Jolly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA), Inc., a New York corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA), Inc., a New York corporat

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Three Rivers Trucking, Inc. A California corporation Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Arun Kumar Jolly Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 01/27/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Non-PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alaska National Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less