This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 02:39:16 (UTC).

Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District VS Santillan

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Santillan. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8001

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALAMEDA-CONTRA COSTA TRANSIT DISTRICT

Defendants

SANTILLAN, JUAN

SANTILLAN, CELIA

SANTILLAN, ERIK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HUGHES, DAVID W

HUNTER III, DAVID E

 

Court Documents

Rejection Letter Issued on Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/5/2021: Rejection Letter Issued on Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5/5/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Consent to Electronic Service Filed

4/30/2021: Consent to Electronic Service Filed

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

4/30/2021: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/11/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 09/13/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

5/11/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 09/13/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District

5/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District

Notice of of Action Filed Filed

5/12/2021: Notice of of Action Filed Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Erik Santillan Filed

7/6/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Erik Santillan Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Juan Santillan Filed

7/6/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Juan Santillan Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Celia Santillan Filed

7/6/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Celia Santillan Filed

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

8/30/2021: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Erik Santillan, Juan Santillan, Celia Santillan

8/30/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Erik Santillan, Juan Santillan, Celia Santillan

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/30/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District Filed

8/26/2021: Case Management Statement of Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District Filed

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Erik Santillan, Juan Santillan, Celia Santillan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/12/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Erik Santillan Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Celia Santillan Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Juan Santillan Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of Action Filed Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/13/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alameda-Contra Costa Transit District

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALAMEDA-CONTRA COSTA TRANSIT DISTRICT, a California public transit authority is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUGHES, DAVID W.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNTER III, DAVID E