This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/03/2021 at 11:23:44 (UTC).

Aguilar vs Mitchell

Case Summary

On 08/24/2000 Aguilar filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Mitchell. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JACOB BLEA III and HARRY R. SHEPPARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9248

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JACOB BLEA III

HARRY R. SHEPPARD

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

EVELYN AGUILAR INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST OF MANUEL AGUILAR, DECEASED

Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Defendants

MITCHELL, JOHN TIMOTHY

GUGICH, LYDIA

NATIONSBANC LEASING CORPORATION

ALLEN, ETHAN

AGUILAR, PAUL

NATIONS BANK

VOGT, STEVEN

COMPLAINANT, CROSS

DEFENDANT, CROSS

EVELYN AGUILAR INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST OF MANUEL AGUILAR, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

JOSEPH SCANLON

WILLIAM G. HOBACK

JOHN D. HOURIHAN

WILLIAM G. HOBACK,ESQ

GARCIA ESQ, PHAIDRA M.

JON H. YORK

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party ETHAN ALLEN, LYDIA GUGICH Filed

7/25/2001: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party ETHAN ALLEN, LYDIA GUGICH Filed

Case Management Statement of JOHN MITCHELL Filed

7/26/2001: Case Management Statement of JOHN MITCHELL Filed

Case Management Statement of STEVEN VOGT, NATIONSBANC LEASING CORPORATION Filed

8/1/2001: Case Management Statement of STEVEN VOGT, NATIONSBANC LEASING CORPORATION Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued

8/7/2001: Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued

Case Management Statement of EVELYN AGUILAR Filed

10/12/2001: Case Management Statement of EVELYN AGUILAR Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party STEVEN VOGT, NATION'S BANK, NATIONSBANC

10/15/2001: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party STEVEN VOGT, NATION'S BANK, NATIONSBANC

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/18/2001: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Miscellaneous Order to Show Cause Filed

10/18/2001: Miscellaneous Order to Show Cause Filed

Case Management Statement of JOHN MITCHELL Filed

11/9/2001: Case Management Statement of JOHN MITCHELL Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed

11/13/2001: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed

11/13/2001: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed

Case Management Statement of Evelyn Aguilar individually and as Successor-in-interest of Manuel Agui

11/15/2001: Case Management Statement of Evelyn Aguilar individually and as Successor-in-interest of Manuel Agui

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

11/26/2001: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

Miscellaneous Case Management Conference Order Filed

11/26/2001: Miscellaneous Case Management Conference Order Filed

Case Management Statement of John Timothy Mitchell Filed

2/7/2002: Case Management Statement of John Timothy Mitchell Filed

Case Management Statement of Evelyn Aguilar individually and as Successor-in-interest of Manuel Agui

2/14/2002: Case Management Statement of Evelyn Aguilar individually and as Successor-in-interest of Manuel Agui

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/21/2002: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Application Good Faith Settlement Filed for John Timothy Mitchell

2/26/2002: Application Good Faith Settlement Filed for John Timothy Mitchell

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2003
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Dismissal with prejudice - entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2002
  • DocketMinutes: Compliance Hearing; Judge: Jacob Blea III; Department: Dept 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2002
  • DocketHearing Continued to Compliance Hearing dept: 707 date: 02/03/2003 time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Transmittal of dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2002
  • DocketMinutes: Compliance Hearing; Judge: Jacob Blea III; Department: Dept 707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2002
  • DocketHearing Continued to Compliance Hearing dept: 707 date: 12/23/2002 time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2001
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint Filed, Date of Service: AS TO JOHN MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2001
  • DocketDepartment: Dept 705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2001
  • DocketCase Management Conference 03/07/2001 09:00 AM D-705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2001
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2000
  • DocketSummons Filed, Date of Service: AS TO NATIONSBANC LEASING CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2000
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint FILED BY NATIONSBANC LEASING CORPORATION - FEE PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2000
  • DocketCase Management Conference 01/16/2001 09:00 AM D-705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2000
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2000
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2000
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOBACK, WILLIAM G

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOURIHAN, JOHN D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCANLON ESQ, JOSEPH