Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/04/2021 at 09:06:13 (UTC).

ADLAWAN VS MAGNUSSEN'S FREMONT IMPORTS, INC., a California c

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 ADLAWAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MAGNUSSEN'S FREMONT IMPORTS, INC , a California c. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3431

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADLAWAN, ADRIEL

Defendant

MAGNUSSEN'S FREMONT IMPORTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SPIVAK, DAVID

BOGGS, JOHN PHILLIP

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service First Amended Complaint Filed

5/17/2021: Proof of Service First Amended Complaint Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for MAGNUSSEN'S FREMONT IMPORTS, INC., a California corporation

6/22/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for MAGNUSSEN'S FREMONT IMPORTS, INC., a California corporation

Proof of Service on Complaint As to MAGNUSSEN'S FREMONT IMPORTS, INC., a California corporation Fil

5/10/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to MAGNUSSEN'S FREMONT IMPORTS, INC., a California corporation Fil

First Amended Complaint Filed

5/10/2021: First Amended Complaint Filed

Complaint - Other Employment Filed

3/26/2021: Complaint - Other Employment Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for ADRIEL ADLAWAN

3/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for ADRIEL ADLAWAN

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

3/26/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 10/26/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

4/1/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 10/26/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4/1/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 22; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for MAGNUSSEN'S FREMONT IMPORTS, INC., a California corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service First Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to MAGNUSSEN'S FREMONT IMPORTS, INC., a California corporation Fil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 10/26/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for ADRIEL ADLAWAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOGGS JOHN P.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPIVAK DAVID G.