This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/08/2021 at 01:19:14 (UTC).

Adams VS Walmart, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 Adams filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4248

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAMS , DONNA PARKER

Defendants

-, DARRYL

WALMART, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ROFAEL, JOHN R.

 

Court Documents

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 10/08/2021 09:00 AM D- 17

7/26/2021: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 10/08/2021 09:00 AM D- 17

Initial Case Management Conference 12/10/2021 09:00 AM D- 17

7/12/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 12/10/2021 09:00 AM D- 17

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

7/12/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

7/8/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Donna Parker Adams

7/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Donna Parker Adams

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

7/8/2021: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 17; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 10/08/2021 09:00 AM D- 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/10/2021 09:00 AM D- 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Donna Parker Adams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Darryl is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROFAEL JOHN R.