This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 04:33:27 (UTC).

Adams VS Lim

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 Adams filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Lim. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY BRAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5828

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JEFFREY BRAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAMS, JESSE CLIFFORD

Defendants

LIM, PYONGSUN "HENRY"

CALLAHAN, LUCILLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SALINAS, ROBERT

ANGSTADT, TODD A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

10/8/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 06/22/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

10/8/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 06/22/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

9/30/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jesse Clifford Adams

9/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jesse Clifford Adams

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

9/30/2020: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued

10/21/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued

First Amended Complaint Filed

10/21/2020: First Amended Complaint Filed

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Pyongsun "Henry" Lim, Lucille Callahan

1/25/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Pyongsun "Henry" Lim, Lucille Callahan

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Lucille Callahan Filed

1/11/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Lucille Callahan Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Pyongsun "Henry" Lim Filed

1/11/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Pyongsun "Henry" Lim Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/22/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/22/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of Jesse Clifford Adams Filed

6/7/2021: Case Management Statement of Jesse Clifford Adams Filed

Case Management Statement of Pyongsun "Henry" Lim, Lucille Callahan Filed

6/7/2021: Case Management Statement of Pyongsun "Henry" Lim, Lucille Callahan Filed

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 22; Action: Complaint Other Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 22; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 22; Action: Status re: ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Jeffrey Brand; Department: Dept 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 11/30/2021 03:00 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketReferred to Private Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 07/07/2022 09:00 AM D- 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 07/29/2022 08:30 AM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 08/08/2022 08:30 AM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Pyongsun "Henry" Lim, Lucille Callahan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Lucille Callahan Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Pyongsun "Henry" Lim Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/22/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jesse Clifford Adams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALINAS, ROBERT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANGSTADT, TODD A.