This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 21:20:24 (UTC).

Abcari VS The Entrust Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 Abcari filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The Entrust Group, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY BRAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0277

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JEFFREY BRAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABCARI , REZA

Defendants

BROMMA , HUBERT

THE ENTRUST GROUP, INC.

ENTRUST ADMINISTRATION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BENJAMIN, NA'IL

GARBACZ, GREG A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

8/13/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 03/29/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

8/13/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 03/29/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

8/7/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Reza Abcari

8/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Reza Abcari

Complaint - Civil Rights Filed

8/7/2020: Complaint - Civil Rights Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

8/25/2020: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Hubert Bromma Filed

8/25/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Hubert Bromma Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to The Entrust Group, Inc. Filed

8/25/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to The Entrust Group, Inc. Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/29/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/29/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of Reza Abcari Filed

3/25/2021: Case Management Statement of Reza Abcari Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/17/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/17/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of Reza Abcari Filed

7/9/2021: Case Management Statement of Reza Abcari Filed

Case Management Statement of Reza Abcari Filed

7/9/2021: Case Management Statement of Reza Abcari Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/13/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/13/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/29/2022

HearingLocation: Dept 22; Action: Complaint - Civil Rights

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022

HearingLocation: Dept 22; Action: Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2022

HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2021

DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for The Entrust Group, Inc. , Entrust Administration, Inc., Hubert Bromma

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021

DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Jeffrey Brand; Department: Dept 22

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021

DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 07/27/2022 09:00 AM D- 301

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021

DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 08/19/2022 08:30 AM D- 22

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021

DocketCivil Jury Trial 08/29/2022 08:30 AM D- 22

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
03/29/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/25/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Statement of Reza Abcari Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2020
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Hubert Bromma Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2020
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2020
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to The Entrust Group, Inc. Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2020
View Court Documents

DocketInitial Case Management Conference 03/29/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Reza Abcari

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2020
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint - Civil Rights Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less