Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/14/2020 at 04:45:03 (UTC).

A-L Financial Corp. VS Shortridge

Case Summary

On 02/27/2009 A-L Financial Corp filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Shortridge. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN PORTER, THOMAS KELLY and RICHARD WOOD,. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8723

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JOHN PORTER

THOMAS KELLY

RICHARD WOOD,

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

A-L FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

SHORTRIDGE, ROBERT P.

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

2/27/2009: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

4/6/2009: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

4/22/2009: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Judgment Entered

4/22/2009: Judgment Entered

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

4/29/2009: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Order of Examination Issued

9/3/2009: Order of Examination Issued

OEX - Dropped - Neither Side Appearing

10/7/2009: OEX - Dropped - Neither Side Appearing

Order of Examination Issued

10/18/2010: Order of Examination Issued

OEX - Dropped - Neither Side Appearing

12/1/2010: OEX - Dropped - Neither Side Appearing

Memo of Costs Filed for A-L Financial Corp.

10/15/2013: Memo of Costs Filed for A-L Financial Corp.

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

4/8/2014: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from San Mateo Filed

4/10/2014: Writ of Execution - Unsatisfied from San Mateo Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution - Unsatisfied from San Mateo Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued To San Mateo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo of Costs Filed for A-L Financial Corp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • DocketMinutes: Judgment for Plaintiff on Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: John Porter; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOEX - Dropped - Neither Side Appearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • DocketOrder of Examination 12/01/2010 02:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Examination Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • DocketMinutes: Judgment for Plaintiff on Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Thomas Kelly; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOEX - Dropped - Neither Side Appearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2009
  • DocketOrder of Examination 10/07/2009 09:00 AM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Examination Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Richard Wood, Pro Tem; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Uncontested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 04/22/2009 02:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A-L FINANCIAL CORP is a litigant