This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/18/2020 at 08:38:30 (UTC).

9921 Medford, LLC VS PSJP, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 9921 Medford, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PSJP, LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PATRICK R. MCKINNEY and FRANK ROESCH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7140

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

PATRICK R. MCKINNEY

FRANK ROESCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

9921 MEDFORD, LLC

Defendant

PSJP, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ROTHBARD, TODD

MAKARIN, SEAN E.

BOWLES, RICHARD T.

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

8/6/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Notice of Settlement Filed for 9921 Medford, LLC

8/6/2020: Notice of Settlement Filed for 9921 Medford, LLC

Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/18/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

7/14/2020: Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/18/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

Hearing Reset to Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 07/23/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

6/18/2020: Hearing Reset to Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 07/23/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 07/29/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

6/18/2020: Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 07/29/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

Notice of Vacation of Premises Filed

6/9/2020: Notice of Vacation of Premises Filed

Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 07/15/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

4/30/2020: Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 07/15/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

Hearing Reset to Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 07/16/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

4/30/2020: Hearing Reset to Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 07/16/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 06/03/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

4/1/2020: Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 06/03/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

Hearing Reset to Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 06/04/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

4/1/2020: Hearing Reset to Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 06/04/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 04/29/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

3/16/2020: Hearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 04/29/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Commenced and Continued

2/13/2020: Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

1/8/2020: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

Order Stipulation to Continue Filed

12/4/2019: Order Stipulation to Continue Filed

Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered

11/5/2019: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered

At-Issue Memorandum - Counter Filed for Defendant

11/8/2019: At-Issue Memorandum - Counter Filed for Defendant

Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 12/05/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

11/12/2019: Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 12/05/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

9/30/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Filed for 9921 Medford, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 08/20/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/18/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 07/30/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 07/29/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 07/23/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 07/22/2020 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAt-Issue Memorandum - Counter Filed for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAt-Issue Memorandum Filed for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAt-Issue Memorandum Filed for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for PSJP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Access to UD Case Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketCourt File Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for 9921 Medfor, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less