Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 12/24/2020 at 18:31:25 (UTC).

2719 Foothill LP VS Paillet

Case Summary

On 06/05/2019 2719 Foothill LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Paillet. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JEFFREY BRAND, KARIN S SCHWARTZ and PATRICK R. MCKINNEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1767

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JEFFREY BRAND

KARIN S SCHWARTZ

PATRICK R. MCKINNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2719 FOOTHILL LP

Defendant

PAILLET, TERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ROTHBARD, TODD

 

Court Documents

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

8/25/2020: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

Complaint Unlawful Detainer Dismissed

8/25/2020: Complaint Unlawful Detainer Dismissed

Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 07/28/2020 09:15 AM D- 511

6/18/2020: Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 07/28/2020 09:15 AM D- 511

Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 08/25/2020 09:15 AM D- 511

7/8/2020: Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 08/25/2020 09:15 AM D- 511

Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 07/07/2020 09:15 AM D- 511

4/29/2020: Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 07/07/2020 09:15 AM D- 511

Order re: Settlement Filed

8/14/2019: Order re: Settlement Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for 2719 Foothill LP

6/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for 2719 Foothill LP

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

6/5/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Access to UD Case Issued

6/6/2019: Notice of Access to UD Case Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for Tera Paillet

6/7/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Tera Paillet

Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff

6/11/2019: Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff

Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered

6/11/2019: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered

Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 07/11/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

6/12/2019: Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 07/11/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

Memo to Set - Counter Filed for Defendant

6/18/2019: Memo to Set - Counter Filed for Defendant

Master Jury Trial 07/15/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

6/19/2019: Master Jury Trial 07/15/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Continued

7/10/2019: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Continued

Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

7/31/2019: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Commenced and Completed

Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued

8/5/2019: Civil Jury Trial Commenced and Continued

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Compliance Hearing; Judge: Patrick R. McKinney; Department: Dept 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlawful Detainer Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 08/25/2020 09:15 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 07/28/2020 09:15 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 07/07/2020 09:15 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 05/12/2020 09:15 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketMaster Jury Trial Hearing Dropped from dept: 511 date: 08/19/2019 time: 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder re: Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Jeffrey Brand; Department: Dept 511

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Court Trial 07/11/2019 09:30 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Filed and Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo To Set Filed for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Tera Paillet Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Tera Paillet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Tera Paillet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Access to UD Case Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for 2719 Foothill LP

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rothbard, Todd B.